This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 12:11:35 (UTC).

FARIS SOUMI VS AYLA HOLDINGS INC.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by FARIS SOUMI against AYLA HOLDINGS INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2670

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUMI FARIS

Defendant

AYLA HOLDINGS INC. DBA THE BEIRUT MIX GRILL

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/29/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/29/2019

10/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/29/2019

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

9/9/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/9/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/21/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • Hearing03/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/29/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 03/20/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: FARIS SOUMI (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: FARIS SOUMI (Plaintiff); As to: Ayla Holdings Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less