This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 11:13:57 (UTC).

FARAHNAZ NADERI VS ALBERT COHAN

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 FARAHNAZ NADERI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBERT COHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2695

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NADERI FARAHNAZ

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant

COHAN ALBERT

Malibu, CA 90265

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

1/5/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/27/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/14/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/5/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order of 01/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/5/2017: Minute Order of 01/05/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

1/5/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/5/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/5/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/31/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/31/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order of 10/26/2016

10/26/2016: Minute Order of 10/26/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/26/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Farahnaz Naderi (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Cohan (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/27/2017 ; Status Date changed from 01/05/2017 to 01/27/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/27/2017 ; Status Date changed from 01/27/2017 to 01/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Invoice: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Fee: $40.00; Balance: $40.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0003595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0009001 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $40.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0009001 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 10/26/2016 to 01/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 01/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Farahnaz Naderi (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Cohan (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Farahnaz Naderi (Plaintiff); As to: Albert Cohan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Farahnaz Naderi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Farahnaz Naderi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0003595 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 08/31/2016 to 08/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less