This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 02:02:35 (UTC).

FARAH GOZINI VS DAPA CORP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 FARAH GOZINI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAPA CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1749

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOZINI FARAH

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendants

SHAHI MITRA

Los Angeles, CA 90049

DAPA CORP DBA LA MAISON INTERIOR DESIGN

2131 Century Pk Ln. #207

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection

10/11/2016: Notice of Rejection

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/9/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/21/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/21/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

9/21/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/12/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/12/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/21/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 09/21/2016

9/21/2016: Minute Order of 09/21/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/21/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/28/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

7/28/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/28/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/28/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2016
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Rejection Sheet Fax filing of Notice of Appeal - Rejected; Submitted by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/21/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/21/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Farah Gozini on 07/28/2016: Defendants DAPA CORP DBA LA Maison Interior Design; Mitra Shahi do not owe the plaintiff Farah Gozini any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • Payment: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0003862 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1160728E8612 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160728E8612 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Farah Gozini (Plaintiff); As to: DAPA CORP (Defendant); Mitra Shahi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less