This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2020 at 02:09:58 (UTC).

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS AT HOME CARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AT HOME CARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9501

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AT HOME CARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CU JOHN T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

3/23/2020: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/6/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN T. CU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

4/2/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN T. CU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result changed from Entered to Granted; Result Date: 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Falls Lake National Insurance Company against Defendant At Home Care, LLC on the Complaint filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company on 10/15/2019 for damages of $24,826.50 and costs of $547.48 for a total of $25,373.98.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: At Home Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from At Home Care, LLC (Defendant) to At Home Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF JOHN T. CU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT; Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company on 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to At Home Care, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company on 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: At Home Care, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2019; Service Cost: 177.48; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: At Home Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: At Home Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: At Home Care, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CU JOHN T.