This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2018 at 17:54:04 (UTC).

EVERBRITE VS LESLIE A BEAN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 EVERBRITE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESLIE A BEAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8177

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERBRITE LLC

Defendants

LESLIE A BEAN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA FUTURE COLLEDGE PREP

LESLIE A BEAN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA FUTURE COLLEGE PREP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM - JOHN D. GUERRINI

Attorney at THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

GUERRINI JOHN D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # NOR467231019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/08/16 . FOR (EVERBRITE) LLC . AGAINST (LESLIE A BEAN) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (FUTURE COLLEGE PREP) . PRINCIPAL $ 10271.83 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 2251.36 . COSTS $ 447.00 . TOTAL $ 12,970.19 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (LESLIE A BEAN) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (FUTURE COLLEGE PREP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LESLIE A BEAN) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (FUTURE COLLEGE PREP) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL-CIVIL REGARDING DEFAULT/JUDGMENT PACKET SENT TO LESLIE A BEAN ON 02-02-16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LESLIE A BEAN) AN INDIVIDUAL DBA (FUTURE COLLEGE PREP) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH MIKE BEAN ON 12/22/15 . COSTS OF $ 77.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR538850007. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less