This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 16:52:49 (UTC).

EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CREDIT UNION VS LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Case Summary

On 05/14/2012 EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5914

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CREDIT UNION

Defendants

LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

SHANA TOVA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RONALD SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • REMITTITUR - JUDGMENT IS REVERSED REMITTITUR - JUDGMENT IS REVERSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • OPINION OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • TRANSMITTAL AND RECEIPT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL ISSUE. SENT TO A.D. TRANSMITTAL AND RECEIPT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL ISSUE. SENT TO A.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED. RE FEES CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED. RE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • BENCH OFFICER NOTIFIED FOR APPEAL NO. --001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • PROO OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED 04-11-12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED 04-11-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • MOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 5/29/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH A DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant