This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 06:11:22 (UTC).

EVA E HERNANDEZ VS SUPER CALIDAD AUTO SALES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 EVA E HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUPER CALIDAD AUTO SALES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0454

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ EVA E

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SUPER CALIDAD AUTO SALES INC.

WASHINGTON INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ALASKA USA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ALASKA USA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KUSTIC SARENA L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sarena Kustic in Response to Status Conference Re: Status of Bankruptcy and Civil Stay

7/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sarena Kustic in Response to Status Conference Re: Status of Bankruptcy and Civil Stay

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 01/26/2021

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 01/26/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

7/30/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

7/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Alaska USA Federal Credit Union

6/12/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Alaska USA Federal Credit Union

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sarena Kustic

6/12/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sarena Kustic

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

4/29/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

2/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

1/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Alaska USA Federal Credit Union on 01/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Alaska USA Federal Credit Union as to Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/31/2022 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Sarena Kustic in Response to Status Conference Re: Status of Bankruptcy and Civil Stay; Filed by: Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 03/10/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/10/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 07/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAffidavit Affidavit Re Venue; Filed by: Eva E Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eva E Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Defendant); Washington International Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eva E Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Defendant); Washington International Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eva E Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (Defendant); Washington International Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC10454    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

(CCP §§ 1281.2, et seq.; 638)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez’s Motion to Compel Arbitration is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of June 30, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of June 30, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On November 13, 2019, Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of Civil Code section 1750, et seq., violation of Business & Professions Code section 17200, et seq., negligent misrepresentation, violation of Civil Code section 1632, implied warranty of merchantability, and claim against surety against Defendants Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc. (“Super Calidad”), Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (“Alaska”), and Washington International Insurance Company (“Washington”). On January 10, 2020, Alaska filed an Answer and Cross-Complaint against Super Calidad. On February 6, 2020, Washington was dismissed from the action.

On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”).

On February 24, 2020, the Court found that Defendant Alaska was not properly served with all moving and supporting papers and ordered Plaintiff to file an amended proof of service demonstrating Defendant Alaska was properly served. (2/24/20 Minute Order.)

On April 29, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement, indicating the parties reached a conditional settlement agreement, and that a request for dismissal would be filed no later than June 13, 2020. (4/29/20 Notice of Settlement.) On June 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Request for Dismissal as to the entire Complaint, which was entered that same day. (6/1/20 Request for Dismissal.)

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reason, Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez’s Motion to Compel Arbitration is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC10454    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

(CCP §§ 1281.2, et seq.; 638)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez’s Motion is CONTINUED TO APRIL 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff must file supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to obey the Court’s order may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On November 13, 2019, Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of Civil Code section 1750, et seq., violation of Business & Professions Code section 17200, et seq., negligent misrepresentation, violation of Civil Code section 1632, implied warranty of merchantability, and claim against surety against Defendants Super Calidad Auto Sales, Inc. (“Super Calidad”), Alaska USA Federal Credit Union (“Alaska”), and Washington International Insurance Company (“Washington”). On January 10, 2020, Alaska filed an Answer and Cross-Complaint against Super Calidad. On February 6, 2020, Washington was dismissed from the action.

On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition or reply briefs have been filed.

  1. Discussion

  1. Service of the Moving Papers

As an initial matter, the Court examines service of the moving papers.

Code of Civil Procedure section 1005 requires that all moving and supporting papers be filed and served at least 16 court days before the hearing, plus an additional 5 calendar days if service is effectuated by mail to a California address. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1005, subd. (b).)

Here, Plaintiff filed proofs of service as to Defendant Super Calidad and Defendant Alaska on January 16, 2020. However, the proof of service as to Defendant Alaska indicates only that the “Declaration of Nima Heydaru in Support of Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Arbitration” was served, but not the Notice of Motion or Motion. (1/16/20 Proof of Service.) Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended proof of service demonstrating all moving and supporting papers were properly served on Defendant Alaska.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reason, Plaintiff Eva E. Hernandez’s Motion is CONTINUED TO APRIL 29, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff must file supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to obey the Court’s order may result in the Motion being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUPER CALIDAD AUTO SALES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington International Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Alaska USA Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant