This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 03:53:49 (UTC).

ETHAN MICHAEL VS TODAY'S MONTESSORI

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 ETHAN MICHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TODAY'S MONTESSORI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2055

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL ETHAN

Defendant

TODAY'S MONTESSORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

Attorney at LEBEDEV, MICHAEL & HELMI, A PLC

10999 Riverside Dr., Suite 201

Studio City, CA 91602

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...) of 03/09/2020

3/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...) of 03/09/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

3/9/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

2/6/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...) of 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...) of 12/09/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...)

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/10/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/2/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of continuance of hearing on expedited petition to confirm compromise

8/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of continuance of hearing on expedited petition to confirm compromise

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/29/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Liv

6/24/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Liv

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...)

6/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...) of 06/06/2019

6/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pendin...) of 06/06/2019

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

5/6/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/8/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Liv

4/24/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Liv

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/11/2019

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/11/2019

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

2/25/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ethan O. Michael (Attorney): Last Name changed from Michael to Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketAddress for Ethan O. Michael (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ethan Michael on 02/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ethan Michael as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); As to: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); Today's Montessori (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); As to: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous): Filed By: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); Result: Signed and Filed; Result Date: 03/09/2020; As To Parties changed from Ethan Michael (Plaintiff) to Ethan Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claima...) of 03/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Liv; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Liv - Rejected; Submitted by: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); As to: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of a Minor scheduled for 06/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Ethan Michael (Plaintiff); As to: Today's Montessori (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02055    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 26

Michael v. Today’s Montessori, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Ruling on Expedited Petition of Leor Michael on behalf of Minor Claimant Liv Michael to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim to be made at the hearing. Petitioner is to prepare a corrected proposed order on Form MC-351 and present it to the Court at the hearing on March 9, 2020. Failure to do so may result in the Expedited Petition being placed off calendar or denied. Petitioner must also clarify at the hearing whether the settlement agreement has been amended to reflect the amount set forth in the Expedited Petition.

ANALYSIS:

On February 25, 2019, minor Plaintiff Liv Michael (“Claimant”), by and through Ethan O. Michael (“Ethan”), filed an Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor with respect to injuries Claimant sustained as a result of an allergic reaction she had at Today’s Montessori Preschool (“Respondent”). Following multiple denials of Ethan’s Petitions, the Court appointed Leor Michael (“Leor”) as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on June 24, 2019. Leor filed an Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor on January 21, 2020.

On February 4, 2020, the Court issued a detailed minute order regarding Leor Michael’s Expedited Petition and the defects therein. The Court set a hearing on the Expedited Petition for March 9, 2020. On February 6, 2020, Leor filed the instant an Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor.

“When a minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, or a person for whom a conservator has been appointed is a party, that person shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1).) Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.)

Having reviewed the Expedited Petition, the Court finds it to be complete and to provide a reasonable settlement to Claimant in light of her injuries and prognosis. However, the proposed order appears to reflect errors from Leor’s earlier Expedited Petitioner. For example, the proposed order indicates the gross settlement amount is $5,411.63 when the Petition states the gross settlement is $5,398.98. (Order, ¶7(a); Petition, ¶12(a).) The proposed order also indicates Petitioner should be reimbursed $5,405.63 for medical and all other expenses, but the Petition states the amount of reimbursement should be $5,398.98. (Order, ¶7(c)(1)(b); Petition, ¶16(b).) Third, the proposed order seeks reimbursement of $474.00 for fees and expenses, when the amount sought in the Petition is $467.35. (Order, ¶7(e); Petition, ¶15(b).)

Finally, the Court notes that the settlement agreement attached to the Expedited Petition does not provide for the same gross settlement amount as stated in the Expedited Petition. (Petition, Attachment 12, § 2.1.) The agreement only provides for a settlement of $4,900.00. (Ibid.)

In light of the foregoing, a ruling on the Expedited Petition will be made at the hearing. Petitioner is to prepare a corrected proposed order and present it to the Court at the hearing on March 9, 2020. Failure to do so may result in the Expedited Petition being placed off calendar or denied. Petitioner must also clarify at the hearing whether the settlement agreement has been amended to reflect the amount set forth in the Expedited Petition.

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC02055    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Michael v. Today’s Montessori, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Expedited Petition of Ethan O. Michael on behalf of Minor Claimant Liv Michael to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

On February 25, 2019, minor Plaintiff Liv Michael (“Claimant”), by and through Ethan O. Michael (“Petitioner”), filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor with respect to injuries Claimant sustained as a result of an allergic reaction she had at Today’s Montessori Preschool (“Respondent”).

“When a minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, or a person for whom a conservator has been appointed is a party, that person shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1).) Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.)

On April 11, 2019, the court issued an order finding it could not grant the Expedited Petition because Petitioner had not applied to be, nor had the Court appointed him as, Claimant’s guardian ad litem. The court noted that Petitioner must first be appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem, or must submit a declaration satisfying Cal. Probate Code section 3500 in order to bring this Petition, if he does not wish to be appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem.

At the following hearing on the Petition, held on June 6, 2019, the Court continued the matter to August 8, 2019. On June 24, 2019, the Court granted the application of Leor Michael to be Claimant’s guardian ad litem. The matter was then continued twice to the current hearing date of December 9, 2019. To date, no amended Petition naming Leor Michael as the petitioner has been filed. Accordingly, the Petition brought by Petitioner Ethan Michael still cannot be granted as he was never appointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem, nor did he submit a declaration satisfying Cal. Probate Code section 3500.

Therefore, the Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor brought by Petitioner Ethan Michael is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.