Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 13:32:07 (UTC).

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS ASTGHIL SYNANYA NAZARETYAN

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASTGHIL SYNANYA NAZARETYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3396

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SINANYAN GRIGOR

NAZARETYAN ASTGHIL SYNANYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAO BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Astghil Synanya Nazaretyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAO, BRUCE