This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 12:35:59 (UTC).

ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5512

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LECAROS ESTELLA VALDERRAMA

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

1/19/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/10/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS on 11/10/2016, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ESTELLA VALDERRAMA LECAROS (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0006231 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less