This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 08:12:29 (UTC).

ESTELA J RAMOS VS NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC., AND DOES 1-25

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 ESTELA J RAMOS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC , AND DOES 1-25. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1552

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS ESTELA J

Defendant

NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Estela J Ramos on 12/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Estela J Ramos as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nature's Sunshine Products is a litigant