This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 08:12:24 (UTC).

ESTELA J RAMOS VS NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC., AND DOES 1-25

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 ESTELA J RAMOS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC , AND DOES 1-25. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1550

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS ESTELA J

Defendant

NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAHBAZ JACOB A

Defendant Attorney

COMMINS DAVID H.S.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/20/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

2/5/2020: Answer - Answer

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Estela J Ramos on 12/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 581 (b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 06/17/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/23/2019; Service Cost: 25.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Estela J Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Nature's Sunshine Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nature's Sunshine Products is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COMMINS, DAVID HARALD