Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 00:57:04 (UTC).

ERNESTO HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS HOAG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 ERNESTO HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOAG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0566

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ ERNESTO

Downey, CA 90241

HERNANDEZ SANDY

Downey, CA 90241

Defendants

CARMICHAEL STANLEY

San Clemente, CA 92673

CARMICHAEL CYNTHIA

San Clemente, CA 92673

HOAG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

10551 Paramount Blvd.

Downey, CA 90241

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/25/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/29/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/3/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

4/5/2019: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/16/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/16/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/25/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/25/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sandy Hernandez and Plaintiff Ernesto Hernandez against Defendant Cynthia Carmichael and Defendant Stanley Carmichael on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ernesto Hernandez, et al. on 01/29/2019 for the principal amount of $2,250.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $2,325.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ernesto Hernandez, et al. on 01/29/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to HOAG Property Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant on defendant's claim Stanley Carmichael and Defendant on defendant's claim Cynthia Carmichael against Plaintiff on defendant's claim Ernesto Hernandez and Plaintiff on defendant's claim Sandy Hernandez on the Defendant's Claim filed by Stanley Carmichael, et al. on 04/05/2019 for the principal amount of $404.00 and costs of $185.00 for a total of $589.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/25/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 04/25/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Stanley Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant on defendant's claim); Cynthia Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Stanley Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant on defendant's claim); Cynthia Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Sandy Hernandez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Stanley Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant on defendant's claim); Cynthia Carmichael (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Sandy Hernandez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Stanley Carmichael (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Cynthia Carmichael (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ernesto Hernandez (Plaintiff); Sandy Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: HOAG Property Management Inc. (Defendant); Stanley Carmichael (Defendant); Cynthia Carmichael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOAG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant