Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 00:34:41 (UTC).

ERIC SARAVIA VS FREEWAY AUTO GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 ERIC SARAVIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FREEWAY AUTO GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9567

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARAVIA ERIC

Defendants

FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC.

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorneys

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

ROGERS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

12/1/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

12/7/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

8/6/2020: Association of Attorney - Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/10/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

8/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to stay the action and proceed to arbitration and [Proposed] order to stay the action and arbitrate this dispute

3/9/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to stay the action and proceed to arbitration and [Proposed] order to stay the action and arbitrate this dispute

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

1/17/2020: Answer - Answer

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, for Stay, and Requests for Costss

12/17/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, for Stay, and Requests for Costss

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

12/2/2019: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit Re Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/16/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Eric Saravia on 10/16/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Eric Saravia as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/27/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Freeway Auto Group, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Freeway Auto Group, Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Eric Saravia (Plaintiff); Foreman Financial Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAffidavit Re Venue; Filed by: Eric Saravia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Saravia (Plaintiff); As to: Freeway Auto Group, Inc. (Defendant); Foreman Financial Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Saravia (Plaintiff); As to: Freeway Auto Group, Inc. (Defendant); Foreman Financial Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Saravia (Plaintiff); As to: Freeway Auto Group, Inc. (Defendant); Foreman Financial Inc. (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC09567    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1281.2, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Eric Saravia’s Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, for a Stay, and Request for Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Proposed Order pursuant to the parties’ Stipulation to be signed by the Court.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On October 16, 2019, Plaintiff Eric Saravia (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of the Consumer Legal Remedies Act, unlawful acts or practices, negligent misrepresentation, and claim against surety against Defendants Freeway Auto Group, Inc. dba 605 Auto, Inc. (“Freeway”), Foreman Financial, Inc. (“Foreman”), and Hudson Insurance Company (“Hudson”). On January 17, 2020, Defendant Hudson filed an Answer.

On December 17, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, for a Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”) as to Defendants Freeway and Foreman. No oppositions have been filed.

On February 25, 2020, the parties filed a Stipulation to Stay the Action and Proceed to Arbitration (the “Stipulation”) with a Proposed Order. The Stipulation indicates that Plaintiff, Freeway, and Foreman agree to resolve the dispute in binding arbitration with the American Arbitration Association (“AAA”) and stay the prosecution of this action. (2/25/20 Stipulation, p. 2.) In addition, the parties agree that the action is stayed as to Defendant Hudson who will not participate in the arbitration proceedings, that Hudson’s stipulation is only as to the stay, and that Hudson takes no position as to the proposed arbitration between the parties. (Id.)

The Proposed Order stays the action to proceed with arbitration with the AAA, requests that all pending hearings currently on calendar be vacated, and requests that the Court set a Post-Arbitration Review Hearing for August 10, 2020. (Id.)

As the parties have resolved the arbitration issue, and pursuant to the parties’ Stipulation, the Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Eric Saravia’s Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, for a Stay, and Request for Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Proposed Order pursuant to the parties’ Stipulation to be signed by the Court.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY AUTO GROUP INC. DBA 605 AUTO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA