This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 04:56:07 (UTC).

ERIC HUBBARD, ET AL. VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 ERIC HUBBARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5559

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUBBARD ERIC

HUBBARD TIFFANY

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUTTING STACEY RAE

TRUMAN RONALD WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

HOSTETLER III H. FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reclassify

11/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reclassify

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

12/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

9/12/2019: Motion to Reclassify - Motion to Reclassify

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 09/16/2019

9/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 09/16/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

9/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

Answer - Answer

7/19/2019: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

6/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/10/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/10/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 12/05/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/05/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reclassify; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 09/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/17/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)) of 09/16/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 09/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/05/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMotion to Reclassify; Filed by: Eric Hubbard (Plaintiff); Tiffany Hubbard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 09/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Eric Hubbard (Plaintiff); Tiffany Hubbard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Hubbard (Plaintiff); Tiffany Hubbard (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Hubbard (Plaintiff); Tiffany Hubbard (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Hubbard (Plaintiff); Tiffany Hubbard (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05559    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION FOR RECLASSIFICATION

(CCP § 403.040)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiffs Eric Hubbard and Tiffany Hubbard’s Motion to Reclassify is GRANTED. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. THE COURT WAIVES THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE.

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Action for products liability, negligence, loss of consortium and punitive damages.

MOTION: Plaintiff moves to reclassify this action on the grounds that this case was filed as an unlimited civil case and should have been classified as such.

OPPOSITION: Defendant filed notice of non-opposition on November 7, 2019.

REPLY: None filed as of December 2, 2019.

ANALYSIS:

On June 10, 2019, Plaintiffs Eric Hubbard and Tiffany Hubbard (“Plaintiffs”) filed the instant action for products liability, negligence, loss of consortium and punitive damages against Defendant American Honda Motor Company (“Defendant”). The Civil Case Cover Sheet indicates that this is an unlimited civil case involving damages of more than $25,000.00. (Civil Case Cover Sheet, filed 6/10/19, p. 1.) The Complaint itself does not indicate that this is a limited civil case, and in fact, alleges medical specials of more than $1 million. (Compl., ¶26.) Plaintiffs filed the instant Motion to Reclassify Action on September 12, 2019. Defendant filed a notice of non-opposition on November 7, 2019.

As it appears this action was incorrectly designated a limited civil case, the Motion to Reclassify is GRANTED. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. THE COURT WAIVES THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE.

Moving party to give notice.