This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 08:42:51 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC VS CASTILLO, EMMA M

Case Summary

On 03/23/2012 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTILLO, EMMA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0364

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

CASTILLO EMMA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE, FLINT C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0010.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR CLERK'S CIVIL JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 5 ONLY..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • OSC SET 09/24/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.