This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 00:26:42 (UTC).

EPG VENTURE PARTNERS, LLC VS PATTY TANENBAUM

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 EPG VENTURE PARTNERS, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against PATTY TANENBAUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3767

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EPG VENTURE PARTNERS LLC

Respondent

TANENBAUM PATTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDLAND STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by EPG Venture Partners, LLC on 11/04/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by EPG Venture Partners, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAddress for STEVEN FRIEDLAND (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPetition PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD; [PROPSED JUDGMENT]; Filed by: EPG Venture Partners, LLC (Petitioner); As to: PATTY TANENBAUM (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: EPG Venture Partners, LLC (Petitioner); As to: PATTY TANENBAUM (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/19/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: EPG Venture Partners, LLC (Petitioner); As to: PATTY TANENBAUM (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EPG Venture Partners, LLC (Petitioner); As to: PATTY TANENBAUM (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03767    Hearing Date: March 10, 2021    Dept: 26

EPG Venture Partners, LLC v. Tanenbaum, et al.

MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285.4)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is GRANTED. JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PETITIONER IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,725.20.

COSTS TO BE RECOVERED BY MEMORANDUM OF COSTS.

ANALYSIS:

Petitioner EPG Venture Partners, LLC (“Petitioner”) petitions the Court to confirm the arbitration award in its favor and against Respondent Patty Tanenbaum (“Respondent”). This action arises from the parties’ dispute over compensation owed to Petitioner under an attorney-client retainer agreement (Pet., ¶2.) Petitioner filed the instant petition on November 4, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

“Any party to an arbitration in which an award has been made may petition the court to confirm, correct or vacate the award. The petition shall name as respondent all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.) “If a petition or response under this chapter is duly served and filed, the court shall confirm the award as made, whether rendered in this state or another state, unless in accordance with this chapter it corrects the award and confirms it as corrected, vacates the award or dismisses the proceeding.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1286.)

Filing Requirements of a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (CCP § 1285.4)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1285.4 states: “A petition under this chapter shall:

(a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement.

(b) Set forth the names of the arbitrators.

(c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.4 (emphasis added).) Petitioner has set forth the substance of the arbitration agreement, the name of the arbitrator, and a copy of the Arbitration Award (Pet., ¶¶2, 4 and Exh. A). This satisfies the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 1285.4, subdivisions (a)-(c).

Service of the Petition and Notice of Hearing (CCP § 1290.4)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 states in pertinent part:

“(a) A copy of the petition and a written notice of the time and place of the hearing thereof and any other papers upon which the petition is based shall be served in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice.

(b) If the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made and the person upon whom service is to be made has not previously appeared in the proceeding and has not previously been served in accordance with this subdivision: ¶ (1) Service within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4.) Petitioner filed a proof of service showing that the Petition papers and notice of hearing were served on Respondent effective November 29, 2020 by substitute service and subsequent mailing. (Proof of Service, filed 2/4/21.) This manner of service comports with the statutory requirements for service under Code of Civil Procedure section 415.20.

Therefore, the Court finds that the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 have been met.

Service of the Arbitration Award (CCP § 1283.6)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1283.6 provides that: “The neutral arbitrator shall serve a signed copy of the award on each party to the arbitration personally or by registered or certified mail or as provided in the agreement.” This requirement may be satisfied by service by the arbitrator or upon proper service of the Award with the Petition. (See Murry v. Civil Service Employees Ins. Co. (1967) 254 Cal.App.2d 796, 799-800.) The Award was served by the arbitrator on May 29, 2018 by certified mail return receipt requested. (Pet., Exh. B, POS.)

The Court finds Code of Civil Procedure section 1283.6 is satisfied.

Timing of Service of Petition (CCP §§ 1288, 1288.4)

A party may seek a court judgment confirming an arbitration award by filing and serving a petition no more than four years, but not less than 10 days, after the award is served. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1288, 1288.4.) The Petition was filed and served two-and-a-half years after service of the Award, making it timely under Code of Civil Procedure sections 1288 and 1288.4.

Merits of the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

The court must confirm the award as made, unless it corrects or vacates the award, or dismisses the proceeding. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1286; Valsan Partners Limited Partnership v. Calcor Space Facility, Inc. (1994) 25 Cal.App.4th 809, 818.) Petitioner has demonstrated that on May 24, 2018, the arbitrator issued an Arbitration Award in its favor and against Respondent for payment of $12,725.20. (Pet., Exh. A, p. 15.) Furthermore, no opposition has been filed to demonstrate any basis why the Award should not be confirmed.

Request for Costs

To the extent Petitioner requests costs according to proof (Pet., Prayer at ¶3), those are permitted on a petition to confirm arbitration award. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1293.2; MBNA America Bank, N.A. v. Gorman (2006) 147 Cal.App.4th.Supp. 1, 7.) Petitioner may file a memorandum of costs pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court Rule 3.1700.

Conclusion

The Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award is GRANTED. JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PETITIONER IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,725.20.

COSTS TO BE RECOVERED BY MEMORANDUM OF COSTS.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDLAND STEVEN