This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 06:22:17 (UTC).

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

Defendant and Respondent

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TYLER & WILSON LLP

DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.

Defendant Attorney

BECERRA XAVIER

 

Court Documents

Statement of Decision - Statement of Decision

5/20/2019: Statement of Decision - Statement of Decision

Objection (name extension) - Objection Whittier Hills' Objection to Defendant's Proposed Judgment

7/10/2019: Objection (name extension) - Objection Whittier Hills' Objection to Defendant's Proposed Judgment

Judgment - Judgment - Court Finding - After Court Trial - 07/15/2019 entered for Defendant CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH against Plaintiff ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH

7/15/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Court Finding - After Court Trial - 07/15/2019 entered for Defendant CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH against Plaintiff ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Entry of Judgment:)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Entry of Judgment:)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Entry of Judgment:) of 07/15/2019, Notice of Entry of Judgment

7/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Entry of Judgment:) of 07/15/2019, Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/15/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/30/2019, Minute order

7/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/30/2019, Minute order

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

8/15/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Summons

1/4/2017: Summons

Complaint - Other Commercial

1/4/2017: Complaint - Other Commercial

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

3/1/2017: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

General Denial

3/17/2017: General Denial

Statement of the Case

5/10/2017: Statement of the Case

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/14/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Motion in Limine (name extension) - No. Four

9/27/2018: Motion in Limine (name extension) - No. Four

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • Hearingat 0830 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by: ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC (Appellant); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC (Respondent); To be paid at Central: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/30/2019, Minute order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Court Finding - After Court Trial - 07/15/2019 entered for Defendant CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH against Plaintiff ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER . Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH against Plaintiff ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER on the Complaint filed by ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC on 01/04/2017 for a total of $0.00. Cost to be determined per filing of Memorandum of Costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Entry of Judgment:)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMNT; Filed by: ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/05/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 01/06/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER COMMERCIAL Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xavier Becerra