This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2022 at 17:49:04 (UTC).

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC VS AURORA CLOTT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AURORA CLOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8568

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC DBA WHITTIER HILLS HEALTH CARE CENTER

Defendants

AURORA E. CLOTT TRUSTEE OF THE AURORA E. CLOTT LIVING TRUST

CLOTT AURORA AKA AURORA E. CLOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPHARD ROBERT CARL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/18/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Summons - on Complaint

6/19/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

6/15/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Affidavit (name extension) - of due diligence

8/3/2018: Affidavit (name extension) - of due diligence

Affidavit (name extension) - of due diligence

8/3/2018: Affidavit (name extension) - of due diligence

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Clott (Defendant); Aurora E. Clott trustee of the Aurora E. Clott Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ensign Whittier East LLC on 06/15/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Ensign Whittier East LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAddress for Robert Carl Shephard (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Robert Carl Shephard (Attorney): Organization Name changed from ensign facility services, inc to Ensign facility services, inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora E. Clott trustee of the Aurora E. Clott Living Trust (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Clott (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of due diligence; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of due diligence; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aurora Clott (Defendant); Aurora E. Clott trustee of the Aurora E. Clott Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ensign Whittier East LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEPHARD ROBERT C