This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 05:21:47 (UTC).

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MOISES K. BECKER VS UNITED VALET PARKING, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MOISES K BECKER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED VALET PARKING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2641

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O MOISES K. BECKER

Defendant

UNITED VALET PARKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PFENNING ROBERT JOHN

Defendant Attorney

GRAHN MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF TRIAL DATE

6/8/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF TRIAL DATE

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

6/29/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/1/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/1/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR O...)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR O...)

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., TO ANSWER FORM FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

10/5/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., TO ANSWER FORM FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE A

10/5/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE A

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/11/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer - Answer

1/31/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - on Complaint

10/9/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

10/9/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/08/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice OF TRIAL DATE; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff); As to: United Valet Parking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR O...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 461.65; scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/29/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/15/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: United Valet Parking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff); As to: United Valet Parking, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2018; Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff); As to: United Valet Parking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Encompass Insurance Company a/s/o Moises K. Becker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC12641    Hearing Date: April 29, 2021    Dept: 26

PROCEEDINGS: (1) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM
INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; AND
(2) MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR
PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Encompass Insurance Company
RESP. PARTY: None
MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR
PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)
TENTATIVE RULING:
Therefore, Plaintiff Encompass Insurance Company’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form
Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For
Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.
ANALYSIS:
Trial in this action was originally set for April 7, 2020. The corresponding cutoffs for discovery and
discovery motions, therefore, were March 8, 2020 and March 23, 2020, respectively. (Code Civ. Proc.,
§ 2024.020, subd. (a).) Following the Court’s continuance of the trial date to April 6, 2021, the
discovery and discovery motion cutoffs were extended to March 7, 2021 and March 22, 2021. The
instant Motions, however, are set to be heard after the statutory cutoff for discovery motions. In fact,
they were set to be heard after the April 6, 2021 trial date. The parties sought a trial continuance on
April 6, 2021 but made no request to reopen discovery or extend the motion and discovery cut-off dates.
The Court cannot grant discovery motions after the cut-off date unless the moving party has moved
under Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.050 to have the motions heard closer to the trial date.
(Pelton-Shepherd Industries, Inc. v. Delta Packaging Products, Inc. (2008) 165 Cal.App.4th 1568, 1586-
1587.) The Court’s discretion in allowing the motions to be heard closer to the trial date than allowed by
Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.020 is bounded by the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure
section 2024.050, which include submission of a meet and confer declaration and the trial court’s
consideration of the statutory factors. (Ibid.)
Therefore, Plaintiff Encompass Insurance Company’s (1) Motion To Compel Responses To Form
Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion To Compel Responses To Demand For
Production Of Documents and Request for Sanctions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.
Moving party to give notice.
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED VALET PARKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pfenning, Robert J