This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2020 at 01:54:46 (UTC).

EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NEW CLOTHING CO , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8027

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendant

NEW CLOTHING CO. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOEL SHERYL D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sheryl D Noel In Support Of Plaintiff's Request For Clerk's Judgment

10/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sheryl D Noel In Support Of Plaintiff's Request For Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/15/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment Judgment

10/16/2019: Judgment - Judgment Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/23/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

10/25/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation against Defendant NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company on the Complaint filed by EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation on 07/25/2019 for the principal amount of $13,595.00, interest of $1,514.04, and costs of $445.00 for a total of $15,554.04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) to NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation on 07/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation, does 1-50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketJudgment Judgment; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Sheryl D Noel In Support Of Plaintiff's Request For Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company; On the Complaint filed by EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation on 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/20/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NEW CLOTHING CO., LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW CLOTHING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOEL SHERYL D.