This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:42:54 (UTC).

EMERGENCY SERVICES RESTORATION INC. VS MARIE SHIRLENE JAYACHANDRA

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 EMERGENCY SERVICES RESTORATION INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIE SHIRLENE JAYACHANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3461

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY SERVICES RESTORATION INC.

4435 W. 153Rd St

Lawndale, CA 90260

Defendant

JAYACHANDRA MARIE SHIRLENE

Artesia, CA 90701

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

4/19/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

4/19/2019: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/3/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/3/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/14/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Postponement, Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

9/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Postponement, Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Notice of Postponement

9/14/2018: Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/13/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/13/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/13/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Emergency Services Restoration Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Marie shirlene Jayachandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Emergency Services Restoration Inc. against Defendant Marie shirlene Jayachandra on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Emergency Services Restoration Inc. on 07/13/2018 for the principal amount of $706.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $776.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Emergency Services Restoration Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/03/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/03/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement, Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/03/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Emergency Services Restoration Inc. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Emergency Services Restoration Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Marie shirlene Jayachandra (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/03/2018; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Emergency Services Restoration Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Marie shirlene Jayachandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less