Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2020 at 04:23:27 (UTC).

ELIZARDO BATRES VS SAFCO CAPITAL CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 ELIZARDO BATRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFCO CAPITAL CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1805

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BATRES ELIZARDO

Defendants

ARDMORE CAPITAL LLC

SAFCO CAPITAL CORP.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/16/2019

12/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/16/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/16/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/16/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/18/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 90 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service): As To Parties: Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant), Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/16/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant), Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant) to Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant), Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Elizardo Batres (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elizardo Batres (Plaintiff); As to: Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/21/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elizardo Batres (Plaintiff); As to: Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/21/19; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elizardo Batres (Plaintiff); As to: Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant); Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant), Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant) to Ardmore Capital, LLC (Defendant), Safco Capital Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant