Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2019 at 00:07:14 (UTC).

ELIZABETH SANCHEZ VS ALBERTO SIORDA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 ELIZABETH SANCHEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBERTO SIORDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1005

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ ELIZABETH

Los Angeles, CA 90002

Defendants

SIORDA ALBERTO

SIORDIA ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/24/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

7/3/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

7/15/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/25/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/25/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/26/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/20/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Befo

3/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Befo

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/7/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/14/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)] and SC-104 PROOF OF SERVICE; SC-104B WHAT

3/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)] and SC-104 PROOF OF SERVICE; SC-104B WHAT

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/26/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/27/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

2/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Hearing12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/10/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/04/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); Result changed from Granted to Granted by Operation of Law; Result Date: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/06/2019; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Signed and Filed to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result: Denied; As To Parties changed from ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff) to ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTO SIORDA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ELIZABETH SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less