This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:31:30 (UTC).

ELISHBA ITURRA, ET AL. VS PETER EWING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 ELISHBA ITURRA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PETER EWING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4108

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ITURRA ELISHBA

SEIDENGLANZ ERIK

Respondents

SAFKEEP STORAGE MELROSE

EWING PETER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Complaint)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Complaint)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/15/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/15/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Complaint

12/15/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition Verified Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

12/15/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Verified Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Complaint scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/20/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPetition Verified Complaint; Filed by: Elishba Iturra (Petitioner); Erik Seidenglanz (Petitioner); As to: Peter Ewing (Respondent); SafKeep Storage Melrose (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Elishba Iturra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Erik Seidenglanz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Elishba Iturra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Erik Seidenglanz (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Verified Complaint scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP04108    Hearing Date: April 20, 2021    Dept: 26

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THE MATTER IS SET FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 15, 2022 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On December 15, 2020, Plaintiffs Elishba Iturra and Erik Seidenglanz (“Plaintiffs”) filed the instant “verified” but unsigned Complaint against Defendants Peter Ewing and Safekeep Storage Melrose (“Defendants”). The Complaint seeks a writ of possession and temporary restraining order with respect to the sale of Plaintiffs’ alleged personal property by auction. (Compl., ¶¶1-3.) To date, no proof of service of the Summons and Complaint has been filed.

The case was incorrectly designated “Other Civil Petition” and set for hearing with respect to the non-existent petition on April 19, 2021. Accordingly, the court changes the designation of this case from “Other Civil Petition” to “Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex)” and takes the hearing on the non-existent petition off calendar. The matter is set for trial on June 15, 2022 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

Plaintiff to give notice.