This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 00:55:19 (UTC).

ELISEN & ASSOCIES, A CANADIAN CORPORATION VS RICHARD HUANG

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 ELISEN ASSOCIES, A CANADIAN CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against RICHARD HUANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3878

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELISEN & ASSOCIES A CANADIAN CORPORATION

Respondent

HUANG RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTER THOMAS SALAZAR

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT) of 03/29/2021

3/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT) of 03/29/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/23/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT

11/23/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT

Summons - Summons on Petition

11/23/2020: Summons - Summons on Petition

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF THOMAS S. CARTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT

11/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF THOMAS S. CARTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/23/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT) of 03/29/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT scheduled for 03/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/29/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT: Filed By: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner); Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner); As to: Richard Huang (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/02/2020; Service Cost: 70.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPetition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Filed by: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner); As to: Richard Huang (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner); As to: Richard Huang (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF THOMAS S. CARTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT; Filed by: ELISEN & ASSOCIES, a Canadian corporation (Petitioner); As to: Richard Huang (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT scheduled for 03/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03878    Hearing Date: March 29, 2021    Dept: 26

Elisen & Associes v. Huang, et al.

PETITION TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1715, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Elisen & Associes’ Petition to Domesticate Foreign Judgment is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

On November 24, 2020, Petitioner Elisen & Associes (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Domesticate Foreign Judgment against Respondent Richard Huang (“Respondent”). California's Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgment Recognition Act (“Foreign Judgment Act”) is codified at Code of Civil Procedure section 1715, et seq. Under Code of Civil Procedure section 1718, a request to domesticate a foreign judgment must be brought as an action, not as a petition. “As the Act requires an action, and does not provide for any procedures other than those procedures applicable to actions, a plaintiff, in order to obtain recognition of a foreign-country money judgment must proceed in accordance with the normal procedures applicable to actions and not by way of a motion or petition to recognize the foreign-country money judgment.” (Hyundai Securities Co., Ltd. v. Lee (2013) 215 Cal.App.4th 682, 693 (emphasis added).)

Therefore, the Petition to Domesticate Foreign Judgment is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER THOMAS SALAZAR