This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 01:48:24 (UTC).

ELIAS ZEPEDA VS STEIN PROPERTIES L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 ELIAS ZEPEDA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STEIN PROPERTIES L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2951

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZEPEDA ELIAS

Defendant

STEIN PROPERTIES L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

15720 Ventura Blvd. Suite 228

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorney

ORLICK MARTIN H

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 10/21/2020

10/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 10/21/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

10/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For Defendant

6/23/2020: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For Defendant

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/23/2020

Order (name extension) - Order .

7/20/2020: Order (name extension) - Order .

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/10/2020

9/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

9/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/22/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/24/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer - Answer

6/27/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

3/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/26/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/26/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/21/2020 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Martin H Orlick (Attorney); Stein Properties L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 09/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Elias Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elias Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Stein Properties L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elias Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Stein Properties L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elias Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Stein Properties L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02951    Hearing Date: October 21, 2020    Dept: 26

Zepeda v. Stein Properties, LP, et al

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Martin H. Orlick, Esq. and Stuart K. Tubis, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Stein Properties, LP is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:

· NO NOTICE OF HEARING ON FORM MC-051.

· NO SUPPORTING DECLARATION ON FORM MC-052.

· NO PROPOSED ORDER ON FORM MC-053.

· NO SERVICE OF THE MOVING PAPERS ON DEFENDANT.

[Declaration on pleading paper instead of Form MC-052. No proof of service of declaration on Defendant.]

[No copy of the proposed order on Form MC-053 or otherwise has been filed.]

No proof of service of Notice of Hearing, supporting declaration or proposed order with respect to Defendant filed.]

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC02951    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 26

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Martin H. Orlick, Esq. and Stuart K. Tubis, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Stein Properties, LP is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:

· NO PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 HEARING DATE.

· NO PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION ON DEFENDANT.

· NO SUPPORTING DECLARATION ON FORM MC-052.

· NO PROPOSED ORDER ON FORM MC-053.[Notice of Motion on pleading paper instead of Form MC-051. No proof of service of Notice of Motion on Defendant.]

Moving party to give notice.