This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 01:00:08 (UTC).

ELEGANT TEXTILES, INC. VS WANTMYLOOK INC.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 ELEGANT TEXTILES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WANTMYLOOK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PHILIP K. MAUTINO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4050

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

PHILIP K. MAUTINO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELEGANT TEXTILES INC.

Defendant

WANTMYLOOK INC.

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (BY FAX)

6/1/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (BY FAX)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

6/1/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/8/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/8/2018: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2018

6/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (By Fax)

8/8/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - (By Fax)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

8/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/9/2018: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

8/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration A total of FOUR occurances of services was attempted:....

11/30/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration A total of FOUR occurances of services was attempted:....

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

11/30/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service (35.00) Sheriff Dept.

11/30/2018: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service (35.00) Sheriff Dept.

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration I went to the Defendant's (Payam) home address on......

11/30/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration I went to the Defendant's (Payam) home address on......

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

11/30/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/10/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Filed by: As to: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/03/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection SC-108: Name Extension: SC-108; As To Parties changed from Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff) to Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection SC-108 (BY FAX): Name Extension changed from SC-108 to SC-108 (BY FAX); As To Parties changed from Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff) to Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer; Filed by: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- SC-108 Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer(Small Claims): Result: Entered; Exact Name: SC-108 Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer(Small Claims); Result Date: 03/18/2019; As To Parties: Front of Closet Inc. (Defendant), Wantmylook, Inc. (Defendant); Status changed from Issued to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (BY FAX); Filed by: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Docket** Case Name changed from ELEGANT TEXTILES, INC. vs FRONT OF CLOSET INC. to ELEGANT TEXTILES, INC. vs WANTMYLOOK INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Wantmylook, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (BY FAX): Status Date changed from 06/06/2018 to 06/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketAddress for Front of Closet Inc. (Defendant) amendment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Front of Closet Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elegant Textiles, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Front of Closet Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Philip K. Mautino in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less