This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 03:57:26 (UTC).

ELEES SMITH VS ADELBERT HOLMES

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 ELEES SMITH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADELBERT HOLMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0504

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH ELEES

Defendants

HOLMES ADELBERT

ATCHESON'S EXPRESS LLC

 

Court Documents

Order on Request for Court Order

2/22/2018: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

2/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer

2/9/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

2/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/11/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/14/2017

12/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/14/2017

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/14/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/29/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits

12/14/2017: Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Other Plaintiffs or Defendants

10/3/2017: Other Plaintiffs or Defendants

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

10/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Filed by: As to: Adelbert Holmes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for Request for Order and Answer: Name Extension changed from [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)] to Request for Order and Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Elees Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC and Defendant Adelbert Holmes against Plaintiff Elees Smith on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Elees Smith on 10/03/2017 for a total of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Elees Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketAddress for Elees Smith (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Adelbert Holmes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Adelbert Holmes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elees Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Adelbert Holmes (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/16/17; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Elees Smith (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketOther Plaintiffs or Defendants; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Elees Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Adelbert Holmes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATCHISON EXPRESS is a litigant