Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 19:45:03 (UTC).

EITAN ALDAD VS COLDWELL BANKER HALLMARK REALTY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 EITAN ALDAD filed an Other lawsuit against COLDWELL BANKER HALLMARK REALTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1804

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDAD EITAN

Defendants

COLDWELL BANKER HALLMARK REALTY

CORPORATION ENTITY AKA ON CENTRAL REALTY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY

YEPREMYAN RIPSI

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/25/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/25/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/25/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eitan Aldad (Plaintiff); As to: Coldwell Banker Hallmark Realty (Defendant); Corporation Entity (Defendant); Ripsi Yepremyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eitan Aldad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases where ON CENTRAL REAL TY INC. DBA COLDWELL BANKER HALLMARK REALTY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant