This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2020 at 08:26:40 (UTC).

EISNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS LOWE ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 EISNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOWE ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4506

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EISNER LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

LOWE ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPOZZOLA DAMIAN D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAddress for Damian D. Capozzola (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Eisner, LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership on 05/27/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Eisner, LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eisner, LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Lowe Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eisner, LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Lowe Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eisner, LLP, a California Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Lowe Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EISNER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN