This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 01:25:23 (UTC).

EFRAIN URENA, ET AL. VS PAUL SIMON BOLIVAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 EFRAIN URENA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAUL SIMON BOLIVAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6923

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

URENA EFRAIN

URENA SARAY

Defendants

BOLIVAR VIRGINIA

BOLIVAR PAUL SIMON

AND DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERMAN STEVEN ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim: Filed By: Saray Urena (Plaintiff),Efrain Urena (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re lodging of proposed order and order for the deposit of funds scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why case has not been dismissed following settlement scheduled for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/27/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/28/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Efrain Urena (Plaintiff); Saray Urena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 07/30/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/27/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Saray: Status Date changed from 07/25/2019 to 08/12/2019; As To Parties changed from and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant), Paul Simon Bolivar (Defendant), Virginia Bolivar (Defendant) to Saray Urena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing for Guardian ad litem re: Saray; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Saray: Status Date changed from 08/12/2019 to 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Efrain Urena (Plaintiff); Saray Urena (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Simon Bolivar (Defendant); Virginia Bolivar (Defendant); and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Efrain Urena (Plaintiff); Saray Urena (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Simon Bolivar (Defendant); Virginia Bolivar (Defendant); and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06923    Hearing Date: October 27, 2020    Dept: 26

Urena v. Bolivar, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Efrain Urena to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim on behalf of minor Plaintiff Saray Urena is GRANTED.

TENTATIVE RULING:

On July 25, 2019, Plaintiffs Efrain Urena, individually and on behalf of minor Plaintiff Saray Urena, filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Paul Simon Bolivar and Virginia Bolivar (“Defendants”). On October 2, 2019, the Court granted Efrain Urena’s (hereinafter “Petitioner”) application to be appointed the Minor Plaintiff’s guardian ad litem. Petitioner filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Saray Urena on February 5, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.) “[A] minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, . . . shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (CCP § 372, emphasis added.)

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it is complete and provides for a reasonable settlement to minor Plaintiff Saray Urena based the injuries sustained and future prognosis. Proposed orders have been filed concurrently. Therefore, the Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Disputed Claim is GRANTED. 

Moving party to give notice.