Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:46:23 (UTC).

EDWIN ORELLANA VS LUZ CLARITA MEJIA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 EDWIN ORELLANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUZ CLARITA MEJIA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5091

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORELLANA EDWIN

ORELLANA PINEDA EDWIN

TOBAR JUAN ORELLANA

Defendants

MEJIA LOPEZ LUZ CLARITA

LOPEZ PERAZA MARIBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN JOSEPH DAVID

 

Court Documents

Summons - on Complaint

12/20/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

12/20/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 77 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Edwin Orellana Pineda (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Orellana to Orellana Pineda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edwin Orellana (Plaintiff); As to: Luz Clarita Mejia Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edwin Orellana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less