Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 07:09:45 (UTC).

EDWIN A PERALTA VS WILDO AMADEO MERELES

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 EDWIN A PERALTA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILDO AMADEO MERELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6430

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERALTA EDWIN A

Defendant

MERELES WILDO AMADEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINTERS JONATHAN D

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

6/14/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default Based on Extrinsic Fraud and Mistake; Points and Authorities; Declaration(s)

4/22/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default Based on Extrinsic Fraud and Mistake; Points and Authorities; Declaration(s)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Bankruptcy Case Filing

5/7/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Bankruptcy Case Filing

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

2/24/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

Judgment - Judgment By Default/ By Court

12/29/2020: Judgment - Judgment By Default/ By Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Errata

12/29/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Errata

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/29/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/21/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review regarding Bankruptcy Status scheduled for 12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 06/14/2021; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy Status scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 06/14/2021; Result Type to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Of Bankruptcy Case Filing: As To Parties changed from EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff) to Wildo Amadeo Mereles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy Status scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Bankruptcy Case Filing; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff); As to: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff); As to: Wildo Amadeo Mereles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff); As to: Wildo Amadeo Mereles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff); As to: Wildo Amadeo Mereles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: EDWIN A PERALTA (Plaintiff); As to: Wildo Amadeo Mereles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERS JONATHAN D. ESQ.