This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 11:57:22 (UTC).

EDVIN RUDY CALDERON VS ALEXIS SOLARES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 EDVIN RUDY CALDERON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEXIS SOLARES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2637

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALDERON EDVIN RUDY

Defendants

SOLARES RAUL

SOLARES ALEXIS

SOLARES TRANSPORT LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/23/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Hearing12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Raul Solares (Defendant), Alexis Solares (Defendant), Solares Transport LLC (Defendant) to Alexis Solares (Defendant), Raul Solares (Defendant), Solares Transport LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Alexis Solares (Defendant), Solares Transport LLC (Defendant), Raul Solares (Defendant) to Solares Transport LLC (Defendant), Raul Solares (Defendant), Alexis Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Edvin Rudy Calderon (Plaintiff); As to: Alexis Solares (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant); Solares Transport LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Edvin Rudy Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Edvin Rudy Calderon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less