This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 00:39:14 (UTC).

EDITH DOLORES HERNANDEZ VS MARIA HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 EDITH DOLORES HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIA HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1003

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ EDITH DOLORES

Defendant

HERNANDEZ MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF DISMISSAL

6/1/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF DISMISSAL

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

6/1/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/01/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

2/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 02/25/2020

2/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 02/25/2020

Answer - Answer

2/28/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

2/28/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/6/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/2/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/2/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Edith Dolores Hernandez on 12/02/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/01/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maria Hernandez (Defendant); As to: Edith Dolores Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 02/25/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Edith Dolores Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Edith Dolores Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Edith Dolores Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Edith Dolores Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11003    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 26

Hernandez v. Hernandez, et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Maria Hernandez’s Demurrer to the Complaint is OVERRULED. Defendant to file and serve an Answer within ten (10) days.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Edith Dolores Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of lease agreement against Defendant Maria Hernandez (“Defendant”) on December 2, 2019. Defendant filed the instant Demurrer on January 6, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

The Demurrer is accompanied by a meet and confer declaration that satisfies the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41. (Demurrer, Sanchez Decl., ¶¶4-6.) Defendant demurs to the single cause of action for failure to allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 430.10, subdivision (e) and uncertainty pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 430.10, subdivision (f).

The Court will not rule on the demurrer for uncertainty, as special demurrers are not permitted in a court of limited jurisdiction. (Code Civ. Proc., § 92, subd. (c).) Regarding the demurrer for failure to allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action, the Court finds that the elements of a breach of contract cause of action are adequately alleged. The Complaint alleged that parties entered into an oral agreement whereby Plaintiff would pay rent in exchange for “a home with all the running services expected of a habitable place and living environment.” (Compl., ¶BC-1.) Defendant allegedly breached the agreement by failing to provide a home that conforms to the standards of a habitable place. (Id. at ¶BC-2.) Plaintiff has allegedly performed her part of the agreement by paying full rent and has been damaged as a result of Defendant’s conduct. (Id. at ¶BC-3.)

The Court does not find, as Defendant contends, that there is any ambiguity in whether the Complaint pertains to an implied covenant versus an oral agreement. The Complaint plainly alleges the existence and breach of an oral agreement. Nor does the Court find that the statement in the Complaint that “more specified facts will be submitted shortly in the form of an amended complaint” to admit any defect or inadequacy in the Complaint as alleged. (Id. at ¶BC-6.) This appears to simply be a statement of additional information and proof in support of Plaintiff’s claim.

Defendant Maria Hernandez’s Demurrer to the Complaint is OVERRULED. Defendant to file and serve an Answer within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ DENNIS JOHN