This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 17:16:57 (UTC).

EAST LA COMMUNITY CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION VS INTERNATIONAL EMPIRE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 EAST LA COMMUNITY CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL EMPIRE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5421

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST LA COMMUNITY CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL EMPIRE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALL OTHER PERSONS AND/OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES KNOWN AS 915 S. DUNCAN AVENUE LOS ANGELES CALIFORNIA 90022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOO S. CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

MOUSAVI AMY

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

6/7/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (International Empire, Inc., a California corporation)

6/11/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (International Empire, Inc., a California corporation)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

7/12/2019: Answer - Answer

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

7/24/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of S. Christopher Yoo in Support of Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant International Empire, Inc.

7/26/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of S. Christopher Yoo in Support of Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant International Empire, Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

7/26/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

7/26/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Strike Answer ...)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Strike Answer ...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/1/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/08/2019

8/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/08/2019

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

8/8/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

8/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

8/14/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: International Empire, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation against Defendant International Empire, Inc., a California corporation on the Complaint filed by East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation on 06/07/2019 for holdover damages $9,889.77 for a total of $9,889.77.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90022 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation on 06/07/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/08/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97 updated: Result Date to 08/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application for Order to Post: Filed By: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: International Empire, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: International Empire, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: International Empire, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: East LA Community Corporation, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: International Empire, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); All other persons and/or entities in possession of the premises known as 915 S. Duncan Avenue, Los Angeles, California 90022 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO S. CHRISTOPHER