This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 14:58:52 (UTC).

CACV OF COLORADO, LLC VS GORDON, GEORGE

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 CACV OF COLORADO, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GORDON, GEORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6163

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

E-TAIL NETWORK INC ASSIGNEE DATE 10/25/11

E-TAIL NETWORK INC ASSIGNEE DATE

CACV OF COLORADO LLC

Defendant

GORDON GEORGE

Assignee

E-TAIL NETWORK INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES - DAVID J. MILLER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES

HARVEGO DEBORAH SUE

Assignee Attorney

STEINFELD REID LAYNE

Other Attorneys

DESAI VIJAY S.

MILLER DAVID JESS

TRAN JOHN DAVID

COHN GEORGE LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

9/14/2017: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • Docket** Case Name changed from E-TAIL NETWORK INC vs GORDON, GEORGE to CACV of Colorado, LLC vs GORDON, GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- CACV of Colorado, LLC 12/03/04 (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from (E-TAIL NETWORK INC) ASSIGNEE DATE 10/25/11 to CACV of Colorado, LLC 12/03/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- CACV of Colorado, LLC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from CACV of Colorado, LLC 12/03/04 to CACV of Colorado, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Vijay S. Desai (Attorney): First Name changed from DAVID to Vijay; Last Name changed from MILLER to Desai; Organization Name changed from LAW OFFICES to LAW OFFICE of CURTIS O BARNES; Middle Name changed from J. to S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketAddress for Vijay S. Desai (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Reid Layne Steinfeld (Attorney); As to: E-Tail Network Inc. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 12654.76. RN CHA505953026 . Filing Fee: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 04E09027 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 585.00 FILED BY (CACV OF COLORADO LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 6122.29 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/13/15 , FOR (E-TAIL NETWORK INC) , AGAINST (GORDON, GEORGE) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 6502.47 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 6122.29 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 12,654.76 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: E-Tail Network Inc. (Assignee); As to: GEORGE GORDON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: George Louis Cohn (Attorney); As to: E-Tail Network Inc. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: David Jess Miller (Attorney); As to: E-Tail Network Inc. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CACV of Colorado LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER DAVID JESS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN JOHN DAVID