This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:06:29 (UTC).

DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC VS JET GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JET GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3908

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DWG INTERNATIONAL LLC

Defendant

JET GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALTZ MICHAEL JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

MANAVI SAMAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

1/8/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/08/2018

1/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/08/2018

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/30/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

10/30/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Jet Group, LLC)

10/31/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Jet Group, LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/31/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

10/30/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

10/30/2017: Complaint

Answer

11/7/2017: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/17/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2018

DocketUpdated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department 94

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2018

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: re: Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/18/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2018

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Dwg International, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2018

DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/08/2018; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office updated: Result Date to 01/08/2018; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2018

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: re: Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2017

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jet Group, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2017

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 10/31/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dwg International, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deborah L. Christian in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dwg International, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jet Group, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less