This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 19:14:11 (UTC).

DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC VS HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2358

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DWG INTERNATIONAL LLC

Defendant

HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALTZ MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/3/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...) of 07/24/2020

7/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...) of 07/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2020

7/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order;)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order;) of 06/22/2020

6/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order;) of 06/22/2020

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Complaint - Complaint

3/5/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/5/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

3/5/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/6/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer - Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer

4/15/2020: Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer - Notice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC on 03/05/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/27/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/02/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's ...) of 07/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendant's Answer scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97 updated: Result Date to 07/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike / Plaintiff's Demurrer to Defendant's Answer scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Order To Post Unlawful Detainer; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post - Rejected; Submitted by: DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/09/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DWG INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HOLLYWOOD AND IVAR, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less