Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2016 at 11:01:06 (UTC).

DUKE PARTNERS II VS. HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 DUKE PARTNERS II filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4651

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUKE PARTNERS II LLC

Defendant

HERRERA MELISSA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA, APC - SAM CHANDRA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. A/S JANEY & JANEY . RECEIPT # 4495866007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 93.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING WITH COUNSEL, MONICA MALEK-YONAN . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING (NOT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/14/16 , FOR (DUKE PARTNERS II) LLC , AGAINST (HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 13800 WHEELER AVENUE SYLMAR, CA 91342 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/14/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (HERRERA, MELISSA MARIE) PRO PER . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 04/05/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUKE PARTNERS II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA, SAM