This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2019 at 01:19:28 (UTC).

DRAWER BOX SPECIALTIES VS JERMYN PARRA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 DRAWER BOX SPECIALTIES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JERMYN PARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2841

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRAWER BOX SPECIALTIES

Defendant

PARRA JERMYN DBA CRUZ CONCEPTS CABINETRY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/14/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/11/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/14/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/14/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/14/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Drawer Box Specialties (Plaintiff); As to: Jermyn Parra (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/17/19; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Drawer Box Specialties against Defendant Jermyn Parra DBA Cruz Concepts Cabinetry on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Drawer Box Specialties on 07/11/2019 for the principal amount of $4,611.87 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $4,716.87.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Drawer Box Specialties (Plaintiff); As to: Jermyn Parra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less