This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 11:21:42 (UTC).

DOWNTOWN PRIME, LLC VS JACQUELINE DARAKJY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 DOWNTOWN PRIME, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JACQUELINE DARAKJY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2430

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOWNTOWN PRIME LLC

Defendant

DARAKJY JACQUELINE

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAD-STEIN MONIQUE STACEY

Attorney at The Rad Firm, APC

1440 W Olympic Blvd,

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Defendant Attorneys

BRAMZON DANIEL JAY

Attorney at Basta Inc.

1545 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite #600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

POST ERIC MITCHELL

HERMANSEN KEVIN PAUL

Attorney at BASTA, Inc.

1545 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/9/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

3/13/2018: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Order

7/10/2018: Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;) of 07/10/2018

7/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;) of 07/10/2018

Minute Order - (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;)

7/10/2018: Minute Order - (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice and Motion for Att...)

5/23/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice and Motion for Att...)

Notice

5/23/2018: Notice

Summons - on Complaint

9/21/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

9/21/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Notice of Hearing Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (initial complaint) - to Strike

10/17/2017: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (initial complaint) - to Strike

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/17/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Ruling - and Trial Date

12/11/2017: Notice of Ruling - and Trial Date

Answer

12/11/2017: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 11/30/2017

11/30/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service) of 11/30/2017

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

11/30/2017: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Jacqueline Darakjy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION ON May 23, 2018;) of 07/10/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Updated -- Notice and Motion for Attorneys Fees;: Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 07/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Ruling on Submitted Matter; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff, Downtown Prime, LLC; Filed by: Downtown Prime, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Darakjy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice and Motion for Att...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice and Motion for Attorneys Fees; scheduled for 05/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Downtown Prime, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/29/2017; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Downtown Prime, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Darakjy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/28/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Downtown Prime, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqueline Darakjy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Downtown Prime, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Deborah L. Christian in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWNTOWN PRIME LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAD-STEIN MONIQUE