This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 12:08:52 (UTC).

DOUGLAS A MASIS VS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 DOUGLAS A MASIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0949

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASIS DOUGLAS A

Defendants

WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL

LING PAUL S

LING EDYTHE I

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/17/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

4/17/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/2/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

5/2/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/20/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/20/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/20/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/6/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

6/6/2019: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: World Unity International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by douglas a masis on 05/02/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 06/06/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Paul S Ling (Defendant) to Paul S Ling (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); As to: Paul S Ling (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); As to: Edythe I Ling (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International (Defendant); Paul S Ling (Defendant); Edythe I Ling (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 06/06/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: douglas a masis (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less