This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 07:01:52 (UTC).

DORON ZAHAVI VS NASCVH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 DORON ZAHAVI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NASCVH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0155

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAHAVI DORON DBA PRIME ACOUSTICS

Defendants

NASCVH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

1/15/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Doron Zahavi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Doron Zahavi on 01/15/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Doron Zahavi as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Nasch Westlake Commerce Center LP (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Nascvh Westlake Commerce Center LP to Nasch Westlake Commerce Center LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Doron Zahavi (Plaintiff); As to: Nascvh Westlake Commerce Center LP (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/16/2020; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Doron Zahavi (Plaintiff); As to: Nascvh Westlake Commerce Center LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASCH WESTLAKE COMMERCE CENTER LP is a litigant