This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2016 at 05:11:22 (UTC).

DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC VS. SHERMAN, VIRGINIA

Case Summary

On 04/17/2014 DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHERMAN, VIRGINIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0888

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

SHERMAN VIRGINIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN DONEL & ASSOC. - BENJAMIN DONEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BENJAMIN DONEL & ASSOC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/18/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC) FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL. #2 IS INCORRECT, THERE IS A FEE WAIVER ON THIS CASE. PLEASE COMPLETE PAGE 2. MS SUBMITTED ON 08/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SHERMAN, VIRGINIA) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (SHERMAN, VIRGINIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (SHERMAN, VIRGINIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A10 , HONORABLE BRIAN C. YEP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/10/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donel, Benjamin