This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 02:33:32 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS JESSICA MICHELLE SANTOS

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESSICA MICHELLE SANTOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4861

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

209 Stonewood St.

Downey, CA 90241

Defendant

SANTOS JESSICA MICHELLE

South Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/13/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/17/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/20/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/11/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/28/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/28/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018

12/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Defendant JESSICA MICHELLE SANTOS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 09/28/2018 for the principal amount of $493.37 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $583.37.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/13/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/13/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/20/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: JESSICA MICHELLE SANTOS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/02/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: JESSICA MICHELLE SANTOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.