This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 18:03:57 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS IVAN M PANIAGUA

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IVAN M PANIAGUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4270

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

PANIAGUA IVAN M AKA IVAN MOJICA PANIAGUA

 

Court Documents

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

5/11/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim - Order for Examination

5/23/2017: Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim - Order for Examination

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/2/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

7/19/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 07/19/2017

7/19/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 07/19/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Maria Rosario Parra

7/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Maria Rosario Parra

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

9/7/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/07/2017

9/7/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 09/07/2017

By Margarita Solis

9/7/2017: By Margarita Solis

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/3/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 01/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/3/2017: Minute Order of 01/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

1/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

2/10/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/9/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Order for Examination; Filed by: As to: Ivan M Paniagua (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketApplication and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued and Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ivan M Paniagua (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0012582 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketPayment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0009142 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); Interest: 6.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 01/03/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 01/03/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Defendant Ivan M Paniagua AKA Ivan Mojica Paniagua on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 11/02/2016 for the principal amount of $702.79 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $772.79.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Marijose Ramirez; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ivan M Paniagua (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/20/2016; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ivan M Paniagua (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0005590 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Clerical Error on 11/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC is a litigant