This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 00:47:39 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS GRANADO JR, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2015 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRANADO JR, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9215

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

GRANADO JR MICHAEL AKA GRANADO MICHAEL MARTINEZ JR

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/23/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/16/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

3/15/2016: Minute Order

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/15/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($35.00)

1/21/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($35.00)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/28/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

2/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

Other - (name extension) - Bench Warrant Recall Confirmation notice (3 pages)

2/21/2017: Other - (name extension) - Bench Warrant Recall Confirmation notice (3 pages)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/21/2017

2/21/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/21/2017

Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Hearing)

2/21/2017: Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Hearing)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/22/2016

12/22/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 12/22/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination and Bench Warrant Hearing)

12/22/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination and Bench Warrant Hearing)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daisy Casco

12/22/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daisy Casco

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Order for Examination

8/24/2016: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Order for Examination

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

8/12/2016: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

10/24/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Marijose Ramirez

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/24/2016

10/24/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/24/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

10/24/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 03/24/2017 to 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 03/29/2017 to 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/29/2017 ; Status Date changed from 03/29/2017 to 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/24/2017 ; Status Date changed from 03/15/2016 to 03/24/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL GRANADO JR (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketBench Warrant - ORAP status updated to Recalled on 02/21/2017; As to: GRANADO JR, MICHAEL ( Defendant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Bench Warrant Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketBench Warrant Hearing scheduled for 02/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 02/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketOther - Bench Warrant Recall Confirmation notice (3 pages); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL GRANADO JR (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0002710 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketApplication and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL GRANADO JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination: Status changed from Filed to Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (GRANADO JR, MICHAEL) AKA (GRANADO, MICHAEL MARTINEZ JR) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 02:44P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. TONY L. RICHARDSON, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY LOURDES MEDINA WITH SPANISH INTERPRETER JOSEPHINE MURCIA, OATH ON FILE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/15/16 . FOR (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) . AGAINST (GRANADO JR, MICHAEL) AKA (GRANADO, MICHAEL MARTINEZ JR) . PRINCIPAL $ 1144.59 . COSTS $ 65.00 . TOTAL $ 1209.59 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GRANADO JR, MICHAEL) AKA (GRANADO, MICHAEL MARTINEZ JR) BY SUB-SERVING JOSE OTTO . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/15/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH258280008. HEARING SET FOR 03/15/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less