This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 01:36:59 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC VS ESPINOZA, MARTHA

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESPINOZA, MARTHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5278

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

ESPINOZA MARTHA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/14/2016

7/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/14/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

7/14/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/5/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

3/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection

3/7/2018: Notice of Rejection

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/14/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Writ - Return

1/12/2018: Writ - Return

Writ - Return - (Partial satisfied)

12/18/2017: Writ - Return - (Partial satisfied)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/14/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2016

6/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

6/14/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/11/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Orange)

5/18/2017: Writ of Execution - (Orange)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/07/2018 ; Status Date changed from 10/13/2015 to 03/07/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) to DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff); As to: MARTHA ESPINOZA (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 132.00; Interest Credits: 217.06; Principal Credits: 1,117.69; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return (Partial satisfied) ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 96.00; Interest Credits: 743.10; Principal Credits: 215.09; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Orange): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 06/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION FILED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (ESPINOZA, MARTHA) . MATTER SET ON 06/14/16 AT 01:30P M., IN DEPT. NE2 . $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS ISSUED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (ESPINOZA, MARTHA) . MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 06/14/16 AT 01:30P M., IN DEPT. NE2 . RECEIPT # ALH256899016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ESPINOZA, MARTHA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 02:23P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JANETTE ROQUE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ESPINOZA, MARTHA) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899009. HEARING SET FOR 10/13/15 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.